U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01519-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chavez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [USCA Notice of Docketing Record on Appeal]
  • January 04, 2023: [Transmission of Record on Appeal to USCA]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Transcript Order Form]
  • December 15, 2022: [Designation of Record on Appeal]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • December 01, 2022: [USCA Order]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [USCA Case Number]
  • March 31, 2022: [Transmission of Preliminary Record to USCA]
  • March 30, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • March 24, 2022: [Amended Judgment]
  • March 23, 2022: [Judgment]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 06, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.