U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01392-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rivera
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 27, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 01, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 26, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • January 25, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 20, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 19, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • November 18, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • November 08, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 18, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • October 18, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.