U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01487-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Del Campo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 08, 2021: [Order]
  • December 06, 2021: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Change of Venue]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • November 12, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Response to Motion]
  • November 02, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • November 02, 2021: [Change Venue]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Order]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.