U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01522-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pace
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • April 13, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • April 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 21, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 19, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.