U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01072-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ireland
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 18, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Minute Order]
March, 2022
  • March 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 15, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 22, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [CJA Appointment]
  • October 20, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • October 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.