U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01512-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Toledo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order]
  • December 30, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 30, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 01, 2022: [Minute Order]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • September 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 19, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 04, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 07, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 08, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 25, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 21, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 21, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • October 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.