U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01525-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Casado-Hernandez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • February 09, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 09, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 08, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • February 07, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of JERS Utilization]
  • January 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Vacate]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Vacate]
  • December 20, 2021: [Vacate]
  • December 02, 2021: [Memorandum Opinion and Order]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • November 18, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 18, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Document]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 02, 2021: [USCA Mandate]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 21, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.