U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01534-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 04, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 04, 2022: [Dismiss]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Judgment]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order to Prepare Petty PSR (Text Only)]
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 06, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 05, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.