U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01527-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodriguez-Sarinana
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Judgment]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 18, 2022: [Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order]
  • April 01, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 10, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • October 22, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 21, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.