U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01418-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gomez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
June, 2022
  • June 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 07, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 10, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 26, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 22, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • October 22, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.