U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01553-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez-Moreno
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 04, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 08, 2022: [Downward Departure]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • October 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.