U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01529-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ramos-Cortez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 14, 2025: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
April, 2025
  • April 08, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Prepare Petty PSR (Text Only)]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 18, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 11, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • May 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 06, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • February 11, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • February 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • February 07, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • February 02, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 04, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 24, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Psychiatric/Psychological Exam]
  • October 28, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • October 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.