U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01510-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Marquez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 26, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 22, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Order]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 23, 2021: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • December 23, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 20, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 20, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Appeal - Detention Order]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 12, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 12, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 09, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 09, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • November 09, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • November 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
  • October 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.