U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00852-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Baca
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 18, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 16, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Presentence Investigation Report]
  • March 29, 2022: [Presentence Investigation Report]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 23, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 16, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 28, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • October 26, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 26, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • October 25, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.