U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01562-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reid
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Revocation Hearing]
  • November 03, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • November 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • April 27, 2022: [Order]
  • April 21, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 29, 2021: [Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • October 27, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.