U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01577-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 02, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 02, 2025: [Dismiss]
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • December 23, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • December 19, 2022: [Discovery]
  • December 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • August 30, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 27, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 01, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 23, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • November 22, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 04, 2021: [Discovery Order]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • October 28, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.