U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01582-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez-Arroyo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 11, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.