U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01573-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Chavez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
February, 2025
  • February 27, 2025: [Early Termination of Probation]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 21, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • September 16, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • September 02, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
August, 2022
  • August 19, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [Order]
  • July 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Reply to Response]
  • June 29, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • June 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 16, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 03, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • May 16, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 16, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 15, 2022: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order]
  • March 15, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 14, 2022: [Vacate]
  • March 06, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 15, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
January, 2022
  • January 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Discovery Order]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.