U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-01535-1
  • Case Name: USA v. West
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Judgment]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • August 04, 2022: [Dismiss]
March, 2022
  • March 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 21, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • March 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 15, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 13, 2021: [CJA Appointment]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 10, 2021: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • November 02, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 02, 2021: [Discovery Order]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 27, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.