U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01576-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Minute Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 21, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 01, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 01, 2021: [Discovery Order]
October, 2021
  • October 27, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.