U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01507-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Day
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Order]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 24, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 01, 2021: [Discovery Order]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 28, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.