U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-01367-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barnes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 26, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 25, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 08, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Continue]
  • July 11, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 07, 2022: [Response in Support]
  • January 07, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • January 07, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • October 28, 2021: [Discovery Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.