U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01531-1
  • Case Name: USA v. De Los Santos-Lazo, et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • December 21, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 12, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw Document]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 20, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 15, 2022: [Order]
  • April 05, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 18, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 07, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 07, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 10, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • November 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • November 02, 2021: [CJA Appointment]
  • November 02, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.