U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01536-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Weathers, et al.,
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • December 01, 2022: [Extend (other)]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • August 26, 2022: [In Limine]
  • August 24, 2022: [Extend (other)]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Judgment]
  • May 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • May 23, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 20, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 08, 2022: [In Limine]
  • April 05, 2022: [In Limine]
March, 2022
  • March 03, 2022: [Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [Discovery Order]
  • March 01, 2022: [Oral Order]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
  • February 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • February 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • February 17, 2022: [Substitute Attorney]
  • February 10, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of JERS Utilization]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 12, 2021: [CJA Appointment]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 12, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • November 08, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 04, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • November 04, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 03, 2021: [CJA Appointment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.