U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01622-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Transfer Out - Probation/Supervised Release]
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Order Transferring Jurisdiction - Part I]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [Judgment]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2021
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 05, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.