U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01340-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Falance
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 09, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 08, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 08, 2022: [Continue]
May, 2022
  • May 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • March 04, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • March 02, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 01, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 07, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 11, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 10, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 08, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • November 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 08, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.