U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01502-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lee
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 16, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 15, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 10, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • November 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 10, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • November 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.