U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01669-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Macias-Villarreal
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2022
  • April 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 13, 2022: [Judgment]
February, 2022
  • February 15, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 16, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [Minute Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • November 12, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • November 12, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.