U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01662-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Arreola-Reyes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 25, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 26, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Downward Departure]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • March 09, 2022: [Extend (other)]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File]
  • February 15, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Document]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • December 07, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 12, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.