U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01654-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez-Jandres
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Judgment]
April, 2022
  • April 07, 2022: [Order]
  • April 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Order]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 12, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.