U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01694-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LaBadie
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
June, 2022
  • June 01, 2022: [Judgment]
  • June 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 18, 2022: [Order]
  • April 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order]
  • March 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 20, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 18, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 04, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • February 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 16, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.