U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-01679-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jaramillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
July, 2022
  • July 05, 2022: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Response (when not to a motion)]
March, 2022
  • March 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
February, 2022
  • February 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 01, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • February 01, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
January, 2022
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 01, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 30, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • November 22, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 17, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.