U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01335-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kline
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • July 12, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 15, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 21, 2022: [Vacate]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 10, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 22, 2021: [Vacate]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order]
  • November 24, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.