U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-01721-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Melton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 02, 2022: [Dismiss]
May, 2022
  • May 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • May 17, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • May 16, 2022: [Order]
  • May 15, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • May 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Suppress]
April, 2022
  • April 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Document]
  • April 22, 2022: [Leave to File Document]
  • April 13, 2022: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • April 11, 2022: [Response in Opposition]
  • April 11, 2022: [Witness List]
  • April 11, 2022: [Exhibit List]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 28, 2022: [Suppress]
  • March 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 14, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • March 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 10, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
February, 2022
  • February 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 03, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 03, 2022: [Proposed Voir Dire]
January, 2022
  • January 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 18, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.