U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01725-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Clark
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 01, 2022: [Reply to Response]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 29, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • November 28, 2022: [Hearing]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.