U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01722-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walls
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 10, 2022: [Judgment]
June, 2022
  • June 17, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • June 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 06, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
May, 2022
  • May 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 07, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.