U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01720-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jaramillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 01, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order]
  • October 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • August 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • June 24, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 10, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • May 26, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • May 23, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • May 19, 2022: [Order]
  • May 12, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2022
  • April 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 14, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 10, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • March 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • March 01, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 20, 2022: [Continue]
  • January 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • January 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 13, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • January 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Extend (other)]
  • January 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody]
  • January 10, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • January 10, 2022: [Release from Custody]
  • January 05, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 27, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • December 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • December 23, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 21, 2021: [CJA Appointment]
  • December 21, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
  • December 03, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.