U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01718-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gallegos
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Downward Adjustment]
  • December 21, 2022: [Downward Adjustment]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • August 10, 2022: [Minute Order]
  • August 10, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order]
  • July 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 22, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • July 19, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • July 11, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 08, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2022
  • May 26, 2022: [Notice of Hearing on Motion]
  • May 25, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 25, 2022: [Suppress]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 11, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 10, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 22, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.