U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01719-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Yates
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 22, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 24, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 28, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2021
  • December 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 15, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.