U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01717-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sanchez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • June 22, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • June 21, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • June 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
May, 2022
  • May 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • May 31, 2022: [Suppress]
  • May 31, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • May 19, 2022: [Continue]
  • May 17, 2022: [Order]
  • May 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • May 16, 2022: [Extend (other)]
  • May 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • May 11, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 09, 2022: [Protective Order]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • March 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 02, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
  • January 10, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 08, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 08, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • December 03, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.