U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01716-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Bresch et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 09, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Reply (when not to a motion)]
  • September 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 16, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 08, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
  • June 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
  • June 07, 2022: [Withdraw as Attorney]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 22, 2022: [Continue]
  • April 18, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • February 10, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 10, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.