U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01709-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mascarenas
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 07, 2024: [Order]
  • October 07, 2024: [Order to Show Cause]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 12, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 14, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 07, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.