U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01700-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anwar
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
November, 2022
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 02, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Revocation Hearing]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
July, 2022
  • July 01, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
May, 2022
  • May 09, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Revocation Hearing]
  • May 04, 2022: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • May 04, 2022: [Oral Order]
  • May 03, 2022: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Order]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • February 19, 2022: [Continue]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • February 09, 2022: [CJA Appointment]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Transfer In/Supervised Release]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.