U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-01862-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DeLeon
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 14, 2022: [Order]
  • November 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 25, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2022
  • July 12, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
June, 2022
  • June 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • June 27, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 16, 2022: [Continue]
February, 2022
  • February 16, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
January, 2022
  • January 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Substitution]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Judge Reassignment (Text Only)]
  • December 14, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 06, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 19, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 19, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • November 18, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.