U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cr-01681-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Saenz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order]
  • October 07, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 06, 2022: [Continue]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
February, 2022
  • February 18, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • February 04, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2021
  • December 22, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
  • December 21, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 21, 2021: [Substitute Attorney]
  • December 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 23, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 21, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 19, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • November 19, 2021: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.