U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00517-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Tucker
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • November 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 03, 2022: [Dismiss]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order]
  • October 25, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
April, 2022
  • April 22, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
March, 2022
  • March 24, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 24, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 23, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 22, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 06, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 01, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 01, 2021: [Order of Detention]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 24, 2021: [CJA Appointment]
  • November 19, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.