U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-01742-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Saucedo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Judgment on Probation Revocation and/or Supervised Release]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order]
  • June 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
February, 2022
  • February 14, 2022: [Judgment]
  • February 08, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
November, 2021
  • November 22, 2021: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.