U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01710-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kinney
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
June, 2022
  • June 08, 2022: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
April, 2022
  • April 27, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 13, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
March, 2022
  • March 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 28, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 28, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 27, 2021: [Continue]
November, 2021
  • November 29, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • November 26, 2021: [Order of Detention]
  • November 24, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [CJA Appointment]
  • November 23, 2021: [Oral Order]
  • November 23, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • November 22, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.