U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:20-cr-01616-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Davidson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Order]
  • January 12, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order Cancelling Deadline]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
July, 2022
  • July 25, 2022: [Continue]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 18, 2022: [Continue]
March, 2022
  • March 17, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 27, 2021: [Continue]
  • December 13, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 10, 2021: [Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 10, 2021: [Due Process Protections Act (Text Only)]
  • December 08, 2021: [CJA Appointment]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 03, 2021: [Rule 5 Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.