U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of New Mexico

new mexico Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of New Mexico
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-01830-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Moreno
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
April, 2022
  • April 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 04, 2022: [Continue]
January, 2022
  • January 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 07, 2022: [Continue]
December, 2021
  • December 20, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • December 17, 2021: [Discovery Order]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Hearing (with Video Streaming)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.